Global Patent Index - EP 1037229 A1

EP 1037229 A1 2000-09-20 - Lift-shift switch

Title (en)

Lift-shift switch

Title (de)

Hub-Schiebe-Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à coulisse de levage

Publication

EP 1037229 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104473 A

Priority

  • DE 19912086 A
  • US 52549800 A

Abstract (en)

The switch has a first operating member (5) for the sliding movement, and a second operating member (8) for the lifting movement. The operating members are returned to their original positions by a returning device, and actuate switching contacts (49,50). The second operating member (8) is integrated into the first operating member. Both operating members are mounted in a housing (1). The contacts are actuated by a rotary actuator (13,34).

Abstract (de)

Ein Hub-Schiebe-Schalter, insbesondere für das Hub-Schiebedach eines Kraftfahrzeuges, umfaßt ein Gehäuse (1), ein erstes Betätigungselement (5) für die Schiebebewegung und ein zweites Betätigungselement (8) für die Hubbewegung des Daches, wobei die jeweils durch eine Rückstelleinrichtung selbsttätig in ihre Ausgangsstellung zurückgehenden Betätigungselemente (5, 8) jeweils über ein Schaltglied Schaltkontakte (49, 50) beaufschlagen. Das zweite Betätigungselement (8) ist in dem ersten Betätigungselement (5) integriert, wobei beide Betätigungselemente (5, 8) in dem Gehäuse (1) gelagert sind und die Schaltglieder als Drehschaltglieder (13, 34) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/00 (2006.01); H01H 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/006 (2013.01); H01H 23/003 (2013.01); H01H 2021/225 (2013.01); H01H 2215/004 (2013.01); H01H 2217/04 (2013.01); H01H 2221/078 (2013.01); H01H 2300/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037229 A1 20000920; EP 1037229 B1 20060920; DE 19912086 A1 20000921; US 6437259 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090308

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090308

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080305

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070301

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013483

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-09-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEPPERT, MICHAEL

2006-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HELLWIG, WOLFGANG

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI