Global Patent Index - EP 1037233 A2

EP 1037233 A2 2000-09-20 - Switchgear

Title (en)

Switchgear

Title (de)

Schaltanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de commutation

Publication

EP 1037233 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105357 A

Priority

JP 7453899 A

Abstract (en)

A switchgear which has a disc-like fixed contactor 6, a moving contactor 10 coming into and out of contact with the disc-like fixed contactor 6, an electric field easing member 7 being placed in the surrounding of the fixed contactor 6, the portion in the surrounding of the fixed contactor 6 projecting from the fixed contactor 6 to the moving contactor 10 side, an electric field easing shield 11 being placed in the surrounding of the moving contactor 10 and having a portion projecting from the moving contactor 10 to the fixed contactor 6 side when the moving contact 10 is at a position out of contact with the fixed contactor 6, and a vacuum vessel 1 for housing the fixed contactor 6, the moving contactor 10, the electric field easing member 7, and the electric field easing shield 11. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 33/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2013.01); H01H 33/66207 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66284 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037233 A2 20000920; EP 1037233 A3 20020911; CN 1267897 A 20000927; JP 2000268684 A 20000929; SG 79304 A1 20010320; TW 445473 B 20010711

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI