Global Patent Index - EP 1037237 A2

EP 1037237 A2 2000-09-20 - Fixing system of a magnetic trip device in a ground fault circuit breaker

Title (en)

Fixing system of a magnetic trip device in a ground fault circuit breaker

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Fixierung eines Magnetauslösers in einem Fehlerstromschutzschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fixation d' un déclencheur magnétique dans un disjoncteur à courant de défaut

Publication

EP 1037237 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103943 A

Priority

DE 19910220 A

Abstract (en)

An electromagnetic release unit (15) is fixed between parallel walls (17,18) of a U-shaped support (16) within a housing (11). The release unit has projections (19,20) which pass through recesses in the walls of the support.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Fixierung eines Magnetauslösers (15) in einem Fehlerstromschutzschalter beschrieben, der ein Joch, einen Permanentmagneten, einen Anker sowie eine Spule aufweist, die in einem Gehäuse untergebracht sind, aus dem ein von dem Anker angetriebener Stößel (22) zur Entklinkung eines Schaltschlosses herausragt. An dem Gehäuse des Magnetauslösers (15) sind Ohren (19, 20) angebracht, die in entgegengesetzte Richtungen, die senkrecht zum Stößel (22) verlaufen, vorspringen. Zur Fixierung ist ein Träger (16) vorgesehen, der zwei in feststehendem Abstand parallel zueinander verlaufende Wände (17, 18) aufweist, die Ausnehmungen besitzen, in die der Auslöser (15) mit seinen Ohren (19) in Richtung des Stößels (22) einsetzbar und einrastbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/02; H01H 71/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/32 (2013.01); H01H 71/0207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910220 A1 20000914; EP 1037237 A2 20000920; EP 1037237 A3 20010829

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040901

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000302

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000302

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000302