Global patent index - EP 1037239 A2

EP 1037239 A2 2000-09-20 - Multi-pole power switch

Title (en)

Multi-pole power switch

Title (de)

Mehrpoliger Leistungsschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur multipolaire

Publication

EP 1037239 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104332 A

Priority

DE 19910032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910032C1] The switch has a switch chamber housing containing several adjacent switch chambers corresponding to the number of poles. There is a common switch shaft (9). Each chamber has interacting fixed and pivotable contact arrangements. Each pivotable contact bridge is mounted in an insulating shaft segment (10-12). Adjacent shaft segments are coupled via separate coupling elements (14,15).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen mehrpoligen Leistungsschalter mit einem Schaltkammergehäuse (2), in dem eine der Polzahl entsprechende Anzahl von Schaltkammern (3-5) nebeneinander angeordnet ist, sowie einer für alle Pole gemeinsamen Schaltwelle (9), wobei jede Schaltkammer (3-5) eine feststehende und eine als schwenkbare Kontaktbrücke (6-8) ausgebildete Kontaktanordnung umfasst, welche mit der feststehenden Kontaktanordnung zusammenwirkt. Um zu erreichen, dass die Schaltwelle (9) des Leistungsschalters (1) auf einfache Weise vormontierbar ist, eine ausreichende Torsionssteifigkeit besitzt und in dem Schaltkammergehäuse (2) zur exakten Positionierung keine aufwendigen Lager erfordert, schlägt die Erfindung vor, die aus Kunststoff bestehenden und die schwenkbaren Kontaktbrücken (6-8) enthaltenden Wellensegmente (10-12) der Schaltwelle (9) über Kupplungselemente (14,15) miteinander zu verbinden, über die sich die Schaltwelle (9) an dem Schaltkammergehäuse abstützt. Hierzu umfasst das jeweilige Kupplungselement (14,15) zwei laschenförmig ausgebildete Teile (16,17), welche über eine Lagerwelle (18) miteinander verbunden sind und die auf ihrer der Lagerwelle (18) abgewandten Seite jeweils mindestens zwei Verbindungsbolzen (19-22) tragen, welche zur Verbindung mit den benachbarten Wellensegmenten (10-12) in entsprechende Ausnehmungen (25,26) dieser Segmente eingreifen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/10; H01H 73/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/10 (2006.01); H01H 73/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/2041 (2013.01); H01H 9/0072 (2013.01); H01H 71/1009 (2013.01); H01H 73/045 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0094 (2013.01); H01H 2071/1036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910032 C1 20000406; EP 1037239 A2 20000920; EP 1037239 A3 20011205; EP 1037239 B1 20030723; US 6259338 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-01-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MULTI-POLE CIRCUIT BREAKER

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-09-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020525

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI