Global patent index - EP 1037243 A2

EP 1037243 A2 2000-09-20 - Auxiliary switch for mounting in a circuit breaker or ground fault interruptor or their combination

Title (en)

Auxiliary switch for mounting in a circuit breaker or ground fault interruptor or their combination

Title (de)

Hilfsschalter zum Anbau an einen Fehlerstrom- oder Leitungsschutzschalter oder an einen FI-/LS-Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur auxiliaire pour le montage dans un disjoncteur ou interrupteur de fuite à la terre ou leur combinaison

Publication

EP 1037243 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104137 A

Priority

DE 19910939 A

Abstract (en)

The auxiliary switch has a first shaft journal (32) coupled with the selector shaft of a protection switch and a tooth pinion section (34). A second shaft journal (36) has a gearwheel section (35) coupled with the tooth pinion section and a projection (37) received in a recess (39) of a slide (20) such that the rotation of the selector shaft causes rotation of first shaft journal, tooth pinion, gearwheel and second shaft journal for driving the slide.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Hilfsschalter zum Anbau an ein Installationsschaltgerät beschrieben, mit dem die Schaltstellung des Installationsschaltgerätes angezeigt oder gemeldet wird. Der Hilfsschalter besitzt dabei wenigstens eine Kontaktbahn (12, 14) mit feststehenden Kontaktstücken (16, 17), die von einer an einem Schieber angebrachten Kontaktbrücke (21) überbrückt sind. Der Hilfsschalter besitzt einen ersten Wellenzapfen (32), der mit einem Zapfenvorsprung (33), der in das Installationsschaltgerät eingreift, mit der Schaltwelle des Installationsschaltgerätes (60) gekoppelt ist. Weiterhin ist ein zweiter Wellenzapfen (36) vorgesehen, der mit dein ersten Wellenzapfen (32) formschlüssig gekuppelt ist, wobei der zweite Wellenzapfen (36) mit dem Schieber verbunden ist, dergestalt, daß bei Verdrehung des ersten Wellenzapfens sich der zweite Wellenzapfen verschwenkt und damit den Schieber in eine geradlinige Bewegung zum Öffnen oder Schließen der Kontaktstellen (16, 26; 17, 27) versetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/46 (2006.01); H01H 73/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/462 (2013.01); H01H 73/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910939 A1 20000914; EP 1037243 A2 20000920; EP 1037243 A3 20020102; PL 338877 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000307

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000307

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000307