Global patent index - EP 1037257 A2

EP 1037257 A2 2000-09-20 - Mercury-free metal halide-lamp

Title (en)

Mercury-free metal halide-lamp

Title (de)

Quecksilberfreie Metallhalogenidlampe

Title (fr)

LAMPE D'HALOGENURE METALLIQUE SANS MERCURE

Publication

EP 1037257 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302009 A

Priority

  • JP 6473299 A
  • JP 21683099 A

Abstract (en)

A lamp voltage corresponding to a lamp comprising mercury is obtained by comprising at least a rare gas, a trivalent of indium halide and a thallium iodide in an arc tube 1, and thereby a long life can be accomplished. In addition, when an enclosed amount of the trivalent of indium halide is approximately 90.0mg/cc or less per unit internal volume of the arc tube and the rare gas is xenon gas with an enclosed pressure of 2.5MPa or less, the luminous flux and the light colour most appropriate for a light source for motor vehicle headlights are obtained. Furthermore, when the thallium iodide is enclosed, the lamp voltage can be made even higher and the luminous flux can be increased. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 61/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/18 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/12 (2013.01); H01J 61/827 (2013.01); H01J 61/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037257 A2 20000920; EP 1037257 A3 20010207; CN 1284736 A 20010221; KR 20010006751 A 20010126; TW 446988 B 20010721

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040609

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI