Global Patent Index - EP 1037257 A3

EP 1037257 A3 2001-02-07 - Mercury-free metal halide-lamp

Title (en)

Mercury-free metal halide-lamp

Title (de)

Quecksilberfreie Metallhalogenidlampe

Title (fr)

LAMPE D'HALOGENURE METALLIQUE SANS MERCURE

Publication

EP 1037257 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302009 A

Priority

  • JP 6473299 A
  • JP 21683099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1037257A2] A lamp voltage corresponding to a lamp comprising mercury is obtained by comprising at least a rare gas, a trivalent of indium halide and a thallium iodide in an arc tube 1, and thereby a long life can be accomplished. In addition, when an enclosed amount of the trivalent of indium halide is approximately 90.0mg/cc or less per unit internal volume of the arc tube and the rare gas is xenon gas with an enclosed pressure of 2.5MPa or less, the luminous flux and the light colour most appropriate for a light source for motor vehicle headlights are obtained. Furthermore, when the thallium iodide is enclosed, the lamp voltage can be made even higher and the luminous flux can be increased. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 61/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/18 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/12 (2013.01); H01J 61/827 (2013.01); H01J 61/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037257 A2 20000920; EP 1037257 A3 20010207; CN 1284736 A 20010221; KR 20010006751 A 20010126; TW 446988 B 20010721

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040609

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI