Global patent index - EP 1037293 A1

EP 1037293 A1 2000-09-20 - Non-aqueous electrolyte and lithium secondary battery using the same

Title (en)

Non-aqueous electrolyte and lithium secondary battery using the same

Title (de)

Nichtwässriger Elektrolyt und Lithium-Sekundärbatterie unter Verwendung desselben

Title (fr)

Électrolyte non-aqueux et batterie secondaire au lithium l'utilisant

Publication

EP 1037293 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00105299 A

Priority

  • JP 7000099 A
  • JP 19435199 A
  • JP 32831899 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a non-aqueous electrolyte solution comprising a non-aqueous solvent and a lithium electrolyte, and a lithium secondary battery using the same wherein the non-aqueous solvent is obtained by adding a phosphoric acid compound prepared by substituting at least one hydrogen atom in phosphoric acid or polyphosphoric acid with a group represented by the general formula Ä1Ü: <CHEM> wherein, X represents Si, Ge or Sn atom, and each of R<1> to R<3> independently represents an alkyl group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms, an alkenyl group having 2 to 10 carbon atoms or an aryl group having 6 to 10 carbon atoms. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 6/16; H01M 10/40; C09K 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 6/16 (2006.01); H01M 10/052 (2010.01); H01M 10/0567 (2010.01); H01M 10/36 (2010.01); H01M 4/50 (2010.01); H01M 4/505 (2010.01); H01M 10/0525 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 10/052 (2013.01); H01M 6/168 (2013.01); H01M 10/0567 (2013.01); H01M 4/505 (2013.01); H01M 10/0525 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037293 A1 20000920; EP 1037293 B1 20070516; DE 60034838 D1 20070628; US 6379846 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141128

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2007-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60034838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-06-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-05-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021030

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010227

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI