Global Patent Index - EP 1037298 A1

EP 1037298 A1 2000-09-20 - Resonant cavity filter for microwave signals

Title (en)

Resonant cavity filter for microwave signals

Title (de)

Hohlraumresonatorfilter für Mikrowellensignale

Title (fr)

Filtre à cavités résonantes pour signaux hyperfréquences

Publication

EP 1037298 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301206 A

Priority

  • EP 00301206 A
  • EP 99460018 A

Abstract (en)

In a filter for microwave signals comprising a plurality of resonant cavities and a longitudinal passage connecting them to each other, said plurality of resonant cavities and said longitudinal passage are entirely filled with a dielectric material whose relative permittivity epsilon r is greater than one. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4837535 A 19890606 - KONISHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al
  • [XY] ABDELMONEM A ET AL: "SPURIOUS FREE D.R. TE MODE BAND PASS FILTER", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, SAN DIEGO, MAY 23 - 27, 1994, vol. 2, 23 May 1994 (1994-05-23), KUNO H J;WEN C P (EDITORS), pages 735 - 738, XP000516655, ISBN: 0-7803-1779-3
  • [Y] MODELSKI J ET AL: "INTEGRATED INPUT CIRCUIT FOR SATELLITE CONVERTER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, LONDON, SEPT. 4 - 7, 1989, no. CONF. 19, 4 September 1989 (1989-09-04), MICROWAVE EXHIBITIONS AND PUBLICATIONS LTD, pages 543 - 548, XP000067322
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 494 (E - 1145) 13 December 1991 (1991-12-13)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037298 A1 20000920

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010720

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI