Global Patent Index - EP 1037299 A1

EP 1037299 A1 2000-09-20 - Resonant cavity filter for microwave signals

Title (en)

Resonant cavity filter for microwave signals

Title (de)

Resonanzhohlraumfilter für Mikrowellensignale

Title (fr)

Filtre à cavités résonantes pour signaux hyperfréquences

Publication

EP 1037299 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99460018 A

Priority

EP 99460018 A

Abstract (en)

A UHF signal filter has a series of resonant cavities connected by a lengthwise passage, the cavities and passage being completely filled with a dielectric material having a relative permittivity greater than one. A UHF signal filter (1) has a series of resonant cavities (2) connected by a lengthwise passage (3). Both the cavities and passage are completely filled with a dielectric material having a relative permittivity greater than one, such as a homogeneous and isotropic ceramic material or a polymer which is easy to mold, has low rate of ageing, and an expansion coefficient close to that of the metal in which the cavities are made. The inlet and outlet ends (4, 5) of the filling material have holes (6, 7) for coaxial cable cores.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un filtre (1) pour signaux hyperfréquences comportant une pluralité de cavités résonantes (2) et un passage longitudinal (3) les reliant entre elles, caractérisé en ce que ladite pluralité de cavités résonantes (2) et ledit passage longitudinal (3) sont entièrement remplis par un matériau diélectrique dont la permittivité relative r est supérieure à un. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4837535 A 19890606 - KONISHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al
  • [XY] ABDELMONEM A ET AL: "SPURIOUS FREE D.R. TE MODE BAND PASS FILTER", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, SAN DIEGO, MAY 23 - 27, 1994, vol. 2, 23 May 1994 (1994-05-23), KUNO H J;WEN C P (EDITORS), pages 735 - 738, XP000516655, ISBN: 0-7803-1779-3
  • [Y] MODELSKI J ET AL: "INTEGRATED INPUT CIRCUIT FOR SATELLITE CONVERTER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, LONDON, SEPT. 4 - 7, 1989, no. CONF. 19, 4 September 1989 (1989-09-04), MICROWAVE EXHIBITIONS AND PUBLICATIONS LTD, pages 543 - 548, XP000067322
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 494 (E - 1145) 13 December 1991 (1991-12-13)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037299 A1 20000920

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI