Global Patent Index - EP 1037304 A2

EP 1037304 A2 2000-09-20 - Miniaturised antenna coil in particular for electronic vehicle closing systems

Title (en)

Miniaturised antenna coil in particular for electronic vehicle closing systems

Title (de)

Antennenspule in Miniaturausführung, insbesondere für elektronische Fahrzeug-Schliesssysteme

Title (fr)

Bobine d'antenne miniaturisée notamment pour systèmes de fermeture électronique de véhicule

Publication

EP 1037304 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102739 A

Priority

DE 19911803 A

Abstract (en)

The coil consists of a prismatic ferrite core (2) disposed on a plastics body (1). The plastics body has metal contacts (5) at its ends for surface mounting of the coil. The plastics body is no wider than the longitudinal extent of the ferrite core and is wound with a coil wire together with the core. The ends of the plastics body which are wider than the core enclose the core up to the start of the winding.

Abstract (de)

Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine Antennenspule mit weiterem Miniaturisierungspotential gegenüber dem Stand der Technik und zugleich hoher Zuverlässigkeit zu schaffen, bei welcher auch andere Nachteile des Standes der Technik, wie beispielsweise der Raumbedarf für die Wandungen eines <IMAGE>Troges", vermieden werden. Diese Aufgabe wird bei einer Antennenspule aus einem prismatischen, auf einen Kunststoffkörper (1) aufgesetzten Ferritkern (2), wobei der Kunststoffkörper (1) an seinen Enden Metallkontakte (5), vorzugsweise zur Oberflächenmontage (SMD) der Antennenspule, trägt, dadurch gelöst, daß der Kunststoffkörper (1) im Bereich der Längenausdehnung des Ferritkernes (2) nicht breiter ist als dieser und mit diesem zusammen mit dem Spulendraht (3) umwickelt ist. Die Erfindung ist bei der Herstellung extrem miniaturisierter Induktivitäten, insbesondere für elektronische Fahrzeugschließsysteme, anwendbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 7/08; H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 7/08 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3241 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037304 A2 20000920; EP 1037304 A3 20011107; EP 1037304 B1 20030820; DE 19911803 A1 20000921; ES 2206093 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100210

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090210

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090210

2009-10-13 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2206093

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003327

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MINIATURISED ANTENNA COIL FOR ELECTRONIC VEHICLE CLOSING SYSTEMS

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020112

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 7/08 A, 7H 01Q 1/32 B, 7H 01F 17/04 B, 7H 01F 27/29 B

2001-01-10 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C3

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI