Global Patent Index - EP 1037310 B3

EP 1037310 B3 2013-09-25 - Sleeve shaped clamping element for strippless connecting electric conductors

Title (en)

Sleeve shaped clamping element for strippless connecting electric conductors

Title (de)

Hülsenförmiges Klemmelement zum abisolierfreien Anschluss elektrischer Leiter

Title (fr)

Elément de serrage sous forme de douille pour connexion autodénudant de conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 1037310 B3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101409 A

Priority

DE 19909825 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1037310A2] The socket has a longitudinal clamping slot (4). The socket body has two spring limbs with cutting edges converging towards the clamping slot. The cross-section of one of the two sprung limbs (5) is tapered in its elastically deformable region towards the clamping slot. The tapered cross-section extends to the cutting edge of the sprung limb. The reduction in cross-section may be continuous.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037310 A2 20000920; EP 1037310 A3 20010808; EP 1037310 B1 20051116; EP 1037310 B3 20130925; EP 1037310 B3 20140917; DE 19909825 A1 20000921; DE 19909825 C2 20010531; DE 19909825 C5 20060126; DE 50011598 D1 20051222

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-23 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 2; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Effective date: 20140604

2013-10-10 [REG DE R056] PATENT LIMITED BY EPO AT PATENTEE'S REQUEST

- Document: DE 50011598

- Effective date: 20130712

2013-07-17 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Effective date: 20130425

2013-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50011598

2013-04-25 [REG DE R055] PATENTEE'S LIMITATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50011598

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011598 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI