Global patent index - EP 1037316 A2

EP 1037316 A2 2000-09-20 - Electrical connection and method of building it

Title (en)

Electrical connection and method of building it

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbindung und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen Verbindung

Title (fr)

Connexion électrique et procédé de fabrication d' une telle connexion

Publication

EP 1037316 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125701 A

Priority

GB 9906003 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connection between contacts of a housing (12, 14) and contacts of a PCB (16) arranged within the housing, the PCB being cramped between housing parts (12, 14) connected by means of screw connection (55) is used to build an antenna coupler (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 13/622 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/714 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037316 A2 20000920; EP 1037316 A3 20020206; GB 2348055 A 20000920; GB 9906003 D0 19990512

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/22 A, 7H 01R 13/622 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI