Global Patent Index - EP 1037321 A3

EP 1037321 A3 2001-03-07 - Electrical connector with a contact securing flap

Title (en)

Electrical connector with a contact securing flap

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder mit einer Kontaktsicherungsklappe

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique avec un contact de sécurité à clapet

Publication

EP 1037321 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00104908 A

Priority

  • EP 00104908 A
  • EP 99104677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1037321A2] The invention relates to an electrical connector with a housing (2) with a plurality of contact chambers (7) arranged in at least one row, with contacts arranged in the contact chambers (7) for making contact with a mating contact and with a hinged flap (3) comprising projections (16) which engage in the contact chambers (7) in an end locking position of the flap (3) and secure the contacts therein, wherein the flap (3) can be introduced into an shaft bearing (13) with a shaft (15) perpendicular to the plug-in direction and is rotatably mounted there. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 12/24; H01R 23/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 12/77 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/661 (2013.01); H01R 13/4362 (2013.01); H01R 12/778 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037321 A2 20000920; EP 1037321 A3 20010307; EP 1037321 B1 20070509

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080308

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080308

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070509

2008-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080212

2007-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60034726 P 20070621

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/436 20060101AFI20061120BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 12/24 20060101ALI20061120BHEP

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/436 A, 7H 01R 12/24 B, 7H 01R 23/66 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI