Global Patent Index - EP 1037326 A2

EP 1037326 A2 2000-09-20 - Lever actuated electrical connector

Title (en)

Lever actuated electrical connector

Title (de)

Hebelbetätigter elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique commandé par un levier

Publication

EP 1037326 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104909 A

Priority

  • EP 00104909 A
  • EP 99104551 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector comprising an actuating lever for mating the electrical connector with a complementary connector, the actuating lever including a deflectable lever leg with a pivot hole therethrough; and a connector housing having a wall with a pivot pin extending therefrom and being receivable within the hole of the lever leg to establish a pivot for the actuating lever; characterised in that: guide members and cams aligned with the pivot pin are included as part of the connector housing; and guide surfaces and camming surface on the actuating lever that are complementary to the respective guide members and cams of the connector housing such that the hole is aligned with the pin and an end of the leg is deflected over the pin, the lever further including a relief feature so that the lever can be operated once the pivot pin is received in the hole. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62944 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037326 A2 20000920; EP 1037326 A3 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050728

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI