EP 1037326 A3 20010207 - Lever actuated electrical connector
Title (en)
Lever actuated electrical connector
Title (de)
Hebelbetätigter elektrischer Verbinder
Title (fr)
Connecteur électrique commandé par un levier
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 00104909 A 20000308
- EP 99104551 A 19990308
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1037326A2] An electrical connector comprising an actuating lever for mating the electrical connector with a complementary connector, the actuating lever including a deflectable lever leg with a pivot hole therethrough; and a connector housing having a wall with a pivot pin extending therefrom and being receivable within the hole of the lever leg to establish a pivot for the actuating lever; characterised in that: guide members and cams aligned with the pivot pin are included as part of the connector housing; and guide surfaces and camming surface on the actuating lever that are complementary to the respective guide members and cams of the connector housing such that the hole is aligned with the pin and an end of the leg is deflected over the pin, the lever further including a relief feature so that the lever can be operated once the pivot pin is received in the hole. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01R 13/629 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01R 13/62944 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] US 5441420 A 19950815 - OKUMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al
- [XA] DE 19738749 A1 19980312 - WHITAKER CORP [US]
- [A] US 5257942 A 19931102 - TAGUCHI NAOTO [JP]
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 07 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 07 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 12 25 December 1997 (1997-12-25)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00104909 A 20000308