Global Patent Index - EP 1037332 A1

EP 1037332 A1 2000-09-20 - Low voltage connector with adaptor and adaptor for such a connector

Title (en)

Low voltage connector with adaptor and adaptor for such a connector

Title (de)

Schwachstromstecker mit einem Adapter und Adapter für einen solchen Stecker

Title (fr)

Connecteur basse tension pourvu d'un adaptateur et adaptateur pour un tel connecteur

Publication

EP 1037332 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400704 A

Priority

FR 9903199 A

Abstract (en)

The connector receives an adapter directly into the rear of the plug facilitating conversion to the alternative coaxial socket fitting. The low voltage connector (1) comprises a number of terminals (11) arranged in pairs, each terminal having a front contact area (12) which is intended to make contact with an associated socket connector and a rear contact area (13) which would normally be connected to wires. In this case the rear contact area co-operates with a contact assembly (23,22) designed to receive an adapter (3a) into which a BNC type connector (4a) may be fitted. The rear contact areas of the main terminals include self-stripping areas to cut through insulation in order to make the required connections.

Abstract (fr)

Connecteur basse tension (1) comprenant une pluralité de broches (11) arrangées par paire, chaque broche comprenant, sur l'avant du connecteur, une zone de contact (12) adaptée à venir en contact électrique lors de l'enfichage d'un connecteur associé (6) et, sur l'arrière du connecteur, une zone de connexion (13) normalement adaptée à établir une connexion électrique avec un fil conducteur respectif, un adaptateur (2) doté de moyens de connexion (21) coopérant, à la place desdits fils conducteurs, avec les zones de connexion (13) des broches (11) et de moyens de contact (23 ; 22) adaptés à venir en contact électrique avec un composant rapporté (3 ; 3a ; 7), caractérisé en ce que lesdites zones de connexion comprennent des contacts autodénudants à fentes (13) et les moyens de connexion de l'adaptateur comprennent des broches (21) insérées dans les fentes des contacts autodénudants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037332 A1 20000920; EP 1037332 B1 20070516; AT 362667 T 20070615; DE 60034839 D1 20070628; DE 60034839 T2 20080214; DK 1037332 T3 20070910; ES 2284459 T3 20071116; FR 2791185 A1 20000922; FR 2791185 B1 20010601; US 6338655 B1 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60034839

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2015-02-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080314

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071016

2007-12-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284459 T3

2007-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-09-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-08-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60034839 P 20070628

2007-06-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-05-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070516

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI