Global Patent Index - EP 1037335 A2

EP 1037335 A2 2000-09-20 - Solid state laser

Title (en)

Solid state laser

Title (de)

Festkörperlaser

Title (fr)

Laser à l'état solide

Publication

EP 1037335 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105505 A

Priority

JP 7018499 A

Abstract (en)

An etalon is provided in the resonator for selecting a predetermined wavelength as a wavelength of laser light to be output from the solid-state laser apparatus. The etalon has at least one surface through which laser light passes, and is arranged so that at least one reflectance of the at least one surface at the above predetermined wavelength is smaller than reflectances of the at least one surface at wavelengths other than the predetermined wavelength. In addition, at least one resonator mirror of the resonator is arranged so that at least one reflectance of the at least one mirror at the above predetermined wavelength is greater than reflectances of the at least one mirror at wavelengths other than the predetermined wavelength.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/08; H01S 3/098

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/094 (2006.01); H01S 3/08 (2006.01); H01S 3/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/08036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037335 A2 20000920; EP 1037335 A3 20030903; EP 1037335 B1 20081126; DE 60040883 D1 20090108; JP 2000269573 A 20000929; US 7088760 B1 20060808

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60040883

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040883 P 20090108

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2008-04-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SOLID STATE LASER

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJIFILM CORPORATION

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI