Global Patent Index - EP 1037582 A2

EP 1037582 A2 2000-09-27 - UNIVERSAL MATTRESS FOR SITTING, LAYING, DECUBITUS PREVENTION AND CURING

Title (en)

UNIVERSAL MATTRESS FOR SITTING, LAYING, DECUBITUS PREVENTION AND CURING

Title (de)

MATRATZE ZUM SITZEN, LIEGEN, DEKUBITUS-PROPHYLAXE UND HEILUNG

Title (fr)

MATELAS UNIVERSEL PERMETTANT DE S'ASSEOIR, DE S'ALLONGER, DE PREVENIR UNE ESCARRE DE DECUBITUS ET DE LA TRAITER

Publication

EP 1037582 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99900221 A

Priority

  • HR 9900001 W
  • HR P980391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003625A2] The mattress and the command unit, according to the invention, are enabling the exchange of supporting area while obtaining, maintaining, reproducing and selfadjusting an optimal operating pressure in the chambers, taking into account the body weight and posture as well as the anthropological measures of the patient. The mattress height is twice or more the chamber width, allowing the better utilization of contact surfaces in depth and on mattress surface which results in lower operating pressure. The mattress enables fitting of contact surfaces to the body shape, and selection of patterns and chamber diameters optimal for undisturbed blood circulation. The mattress is very easy maintainable: it is simple to wash, dries quickly, ventilates spontaneously; it can be ventilated and heated artificially. Its purpose is a comfortable sitting, laying, leaning, decubitus prevention, decubitus healing and preventing of new decubitus wounds appearance. The mattress can be used as a supplement to beds, chairs, wheelchairs, vehicle seats, as a support to lean a head, as an aid bedstead to be used directly on floor or ground. The last is an advantage in circumstances of war or catastrophes. MUTI is significantly cheaper than similar antidecubitus mattresses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/08 (2006.01); A61G 7/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/05776 (2013.01); A61G 7/05784 (2016.11); A61G 7/05715 (2013.01); A61G 7/05723 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003625 A2 20000127; WO 0003625 A3 20000330; WO 0003625 A8 20000615; AU 1884799 A 20000207; CZ 20001316 A3 20011212; EP 1037582 A2 20000927; HR P980391 A2 20001231

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-15 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20020623

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARICEVIC, ZORAN

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARICEVIC, ZDRAVKO

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARICEVIC, ZDRAVCO

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-12-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI