Global Patent Index - EP 1037610 A1

EP 1037610 A1 2000-09-27 - LIPOSOMAL CAMPTOTHECIN FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

LIPOSOMAL CAMPTOTHECIN FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

LIPOSOMALE CAMPTOTHECIN FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE LIPOSOMES RENFERMANT DE LA CAMPTOTHECINE

Publication

EP 1037610 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946983 A

Priority

  • US 9819086 W
  • US 5908397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913816A2] Liposomal encapsulated camptothecin formulations are provided. The liposomes have improved pharmacokinetics, enhanced efficacy as anti-tumor agents and provide an increased therapeutic index as compared to the free drug and topotecan. The formulations include liposomes comprising at least one phospholipid and a camptothecin or analog thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/127; A61K 31/4745

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 31/4745 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 47/04 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/16 (2006.01); A61K 47/24 (2006.01); A61K 47/28 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/127 (2013.01); A61K 9/1278 (2013.01); A61K 31/4745 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913816 A2 19990325; WO 9913816 A3 20011101; AU 751439 B2 20020815; AU 9387798 A 19990405; BR 9812316 A 20010320; CA 2303366 A1 19990325; EP 1037610 A1 20000927; EP 1037610 A4 20040707; JP 2003510239 A 20030318; NZ 503293 A 20020927

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031103

2010-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091006

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-07-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/127 A

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/4745 B

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2002-02-06 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-03-07 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000417;LT PAYMENT 20000417;LV PAYMENT 20000417;MK PAYMENT 20000417;RO PAYMENT 20000417;SI PAYMENT 20000417