Global Patent Index - EP 1037669 A1

EP 1037669 A1 2000-09-27 - THERAPEUTIC USE OF LENTIVIRAL VECTORS

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC USE OF LENTIVIRAL VECTORS

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE NUTZUNG VON LENTIVIRALEN VEKTOREN

Title (fr)

EMPLOI THERAPEUTIQUE DE VECTEURS LENTIVIRAUX

Publication

EP 1037669 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962895 A

Priority

  • US 9825720 W
  • US 6957997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930742A1] A lentivirus vector inhibits propagation of a lentivirus in a cell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; A61K 35/00; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); C07K 14/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/76 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930742 A1 19990624; AU 1803599 A 19990705; AU 749059 B2 20020620; CA 2314683 A1 19990624; EP 1037669 A1 20000927; EP 1037669 A4 20030402; JP 2002508338 A 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELL GENESYS, INC.

2003-04-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/86 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/14 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/18 B

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELL GENESYS, INC.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NALDINI, LUIGI

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SONG, JIN-PING

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE