Global patent index - EP 1037714 A1

EP 1037714 A1 2000-09-27 - DEVICE FOR PACKAGING AND DISPENSING A PRODUCT, WITH MANUAL PUMP AND AIR INTAKE FILTER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PACKAGING AND DISPENSING A PRODUCT, WITH MANUAL PUMP AND AIR INTAKE FILTER

Title (de)

AUFBEWAHRUNGS- UND AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN PRODUKT, MIT EINER HANDBETÄTIGTEN PUMPE UND LUFTEINLASSFILTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONDITIONNEMENT ET DISTRIBUTION D'UN PRODUIT, AVEC POMPE MANUELLE ET FILTRE D'ENTREE D'AIR

Publication

EP 1037714 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98958963 A

Priority

  • FR 9802640 W
  • FR 9715469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772007A1] The invention concerns a device comprising a rigid container (15), a manual pump (13), mounted on the container (15) for dispensing in unit doses the product contained in the container (15), and a filter (26) for filtering outside air entering the container (15) when the pump (13) is actuated. The pump (13) has no air intake in the container (15) and the filter (26) is arranged in an air intake passage provided in the container (15) base (35), which is injection-moulded. The invention is useful for packaging and dispensing fluid, in particular liquids, which need to be kept germ-free.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00; B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0021 (2013.01); B05B 11/0018 (2013.01); B05B 11/0024 (2013.01); B05B 11/0037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929433A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772007 A1 19990611; FR 2772007 B1 20000204; CA 2312881 A1 19990617; CN 1281389 A 20010124; DE 69816336 D1 20030814; DE 69816336 T2 20040609; EP 1037714 A1 20000927; EP 1037714 B1 20030709; JP 2001525249 A 20011211; US 6354469 B1 20020312; WO 9929433 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061207

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061207

2005-11-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69816336

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT