Global Patent Index - EP 1037727 A1

EP 1037727 A1 2000-09-27 - DEVICE FOR MACHINING THE EDGES OF SPECTACLE GLASSES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MACHINING THE EDGES OF SPECTACLE GLASSES

Title (de)

BRILLENGLASRANDBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'USINAGE DE BORD DE VERRE DE LUNETTES

Publication

EP 1037727 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948904 A

Priority

  • DE 19738668 A
  • EP 9805596 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738668A1] The invention relates to a device for machining the edges of spectacle glasses, comprising a spectacle glass holder for a rough glass held on at least one side and a machining device for full machining of said glass by means of a separating cut to provide an upper facette, a peripheral groove or grooves which can be used to fasten a spectacle frame using clips or or drill holes and, optionally, to polish the machined surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B24B 17/02; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 17/02 (2006.01); B24B 19/03 (2006.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2013.01); B24B 17/026 (2013.01); B24B 19/03 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911429A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738668 A1 19990318; EP 1037727 A1 20000927; EP 1037727 B1 20030402; WO 9911429 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2006-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807770 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000401

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT