Global Patent Index - EP 1037746 A2

EP 1037746 A2 2000-09-27 - WEB GUIDING ROLLER

Title (en)

WEB GUIDING ROLLER

Title (de)

BAHNFÜHRUNGSWALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU DE GUIDAGE D'UNE FEUILLE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1037746 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98966772 A

Priority

  • DE 9803640 W
  • DE 19755317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755317A1] In a web guiding system for a rotary printing press, printed webs, in particular, are deflected without smearing in that the acting diameter of a rubber-covered cylinder of a printing mechanism corresponds to the diameter of a driven web guiding roller or, in certain conditions, to an integral multiple of this diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 22/00 (2013.01); B41F 13/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929507A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755317 A1 19990617; EP 1037746 A2 20000927; EP 1037746 B1 20011017; JP 2001525274 A 20011211; JP 3387056 B2 20030317; US 6371020 B1 20020416; WO 9929507 A2 19990617; WO 9929507 A3 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801816

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801816 20011122

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 1/00 A, 7B 41F 13/02 B, 7B 41F 22/00 B

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI