Global Patent Index - EP 1037749 A1

EP 1037749 A1 2000-09-27 - PRINTED PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRINTED PRODUCT

Title (en)

PRINTED PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRINTED PRODUCT

Title (de)

DRUCKPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DRUCKPRODUKTES

Title (fr)

PRODUIT D'IMPRIMERIE ET SON PROCEDE DE REALISATION

Publication

EP 1037749 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966551 A

Priority

  • DE 9803697 W
  • DE 19755691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930910A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a printed product on a web-fed rotary newspaper-printing press. The aim of the invention is to produce a product whose dimensions may be varied. To this end, using paper webs with a constant width, one or more sub-paper webs (2, 4, 7, 8, 9, 11, 12) of a preselected and at least somewhat smaller width are combined and brought together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930910A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930910 A1 19990624; DE 59802100 D1 20011213; EP 1037749 A1 20000927; EP 1037749 B1 20011107; US 2002195813 A1 20021226; US 6896250 B2 20050524

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802100

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI