Global Patent Index - EP 1037800 A1

EP 1037800 A1 2000-09-27 - MACHINE FOR SETTING HEAT-SHRINKABLE SLEEVES ON OBJECTS FROM A CONTINUOUS SHEATH

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR SETTING HEAT-SHRINKABLE SLEEVES ON OBJECTS FROM A CONTINUOUS SHEATH

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON AUS EINEM KONTINUIERLICHEN SCHLAUCH HERGESTELLTEN, WÄRMESCHRUMPFBAREN HÜLSEN AUF GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE POSE DE MANCHONS THERMORETRACTABLES SUR DES OBJETS, A PARTIR D' UNE GAINE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1037800 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98958979 A

Priority

  • FR 9802656 W
  • FR 9715784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772344A1] The invention concerns a machine for setting heat-shrinkable plastic sleeves on objects, from a flat-wound continuous sheath, characterised in that a horizontal shaping sleeve (40) is provided comprising two coaxial separator heads (41, 42) mutually connected by a central wire element (43), the two separator heads having facing ends (45, 46) with smooth double bevel and each resting freely on an associated V-shaped support (60). The means driving the sheath comprises, between the two V-shaped supports (60), two adjacent pinch rollers (25, 26) symmetrically arranged on either side of the wire element (43) and passing in the proximity of the smooth bevelled edges of the separator heads (41, 42), each roller (25, 26) having a peripheral groove matching that of the other roller so as to form a passage with horizontal axis for said wire element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/14; B65C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/14 (2006.01); B65C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/065 (2013.01); B65B 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930970A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772344 A1 19990618; FR 2772344 B1 20000204; AU 1492799 A 19990705; CA 2314090 A1 19990624; DE 69803880 D1 20020321; DE 69803880 T2 20021107; EP 1037800 A1 20000927; EP 1037800 B1 20020213; ES 2172249 T3 20020916; US 6523331 B1 20030225; WO 9930970 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051208

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031209

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031208

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SLEEVER INTERNATIONAL CY

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021208

2002-12-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021204

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172249 T3

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803880 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL