Global Patent Index - EP 1037807 A2

EP 1037807 A2 2000-09-27 - PACKAGING FOR AT LEAST TWO TABLET SHAPED OBJECTS

Title (en)

PACKAGING FOR AT LEAST TWO TABLET SHAPED OBJECTS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG FÜR WENIGSTENS ZWEI TABLETTENFÖRMIGE GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE POUR AU MOINS DEUX OBJETS EN FORME DE PASTILLES

Publication

EP 1037807 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98967085 A

Priority

  • DE 19756667 A
  • DE 19840390 A
  • EP 9808045 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944895A2] Packaging for at least two tablet shaped objects, especially detergent or cleansing agent tablets, in the form of a closed foil bag. The aim of the invention is to improve said packaging in as simple a manner possible in order to prevent several tablets in the same packaging from being damaged while at the same time allowing for all tablets contained in said packaging to be removed in a single opening process. This is achieved by dividing the interior of the foil bag (1) into a number of areas (5, 6) corresponding to the amount of tablets (4) that are to be accommodated. Each area is separated from by a seam (7, 7', 7'') which prevents the adjacent tablets (4) from coming into contact with each other. The seam (7, 7', 7'') extends between the accommodating areas (5, 6) at certain points only, whereby a seamless zone (8, 8', 8'') is created. A tear-off line (9, 9', 9'') is also provided, touching all of the accommodating areas (5, 6) along the seamless zones (8, 8', 8'') when torn.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/46 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3261 (2013.01); B65D 75/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944895A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944895 A2 19990910; WO 9944895 A3 19991111; WO 9944895 A8 20000921; AT 237509 T 20030515; EP 1037807 A2 20000927; EP 1037807 B1 20030416; JP 2002505234 A 20020219; JP 3549485 B2 20040804

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081210

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071206

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807996 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL