Global patent index - EP 1037815 A1

EP 1037815 A1 2000-09-27 - A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR SILICONISING RUBBER STOPPERS

Title (en)

A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR SILICONISING RUBBER STOPPERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SILIKONISIERUNG VON GUMMISTOPFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SILICONAGE DE BOUCHONS EN CAOUTCHOUC

Publication

EP 1037815 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920777 A

Priority

  • SE 9800738 W
  • SE 9701602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849069A1] The invention concerns a method of treating rubber stoppers intended to seal packages containing sterile products. After washing, rinsing and thereafter siliconising said rubber stoppers in an emulsion of silicone oil and water, the stoppers are sterilised and dried. According to the inventive method silicone oil and water are mixed under sufficiently vigorous stirring to produce an emulsion, whereafter the resulting emulsion is transferred to a container (11) in which the stoppers are stored and the siliconising process is carried out. A device for performing this method comprises a first pump (4) arranged to pump dosed amounts of silicon, and a second pump (9) arranged to form, while exercising a strong dispersing action, an emulsion from the water and the amounts of silicon and to pump the resulting emulsion to the container (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 39/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/02 (2006.01); B65D 39/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849069A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849069 A1 19981105; AU 7354198 A 19981124; DE 69809083 D1 20021205; DE 69809083 T2 20030724; DE 69809083 T3 20060316; EP 1037815 A1 20000927; EP 1037815 B1 20021030; EP 1037815 B2 20050629; JP 2001522339 A 20011113; JP 4190037 B2 20081203; SE 512231 C2 20000214; SE 9701602 D0 19970429; SE 9701602 L 19981030

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160401

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160406

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160404

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-03-31 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2005-09-26 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2005-07-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-06-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI

2003-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AXIMA STERITEC GMBH

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-02-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-01-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GETINGE STERILIZATION AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809083

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI