Global Patent Index - EP 1037823 A1

EP 1037823 A1 2000-09-27 - UNIT DOSE DISPENSE PACKAGE

Title (en)

UNIT DOSE DISPENSE PACKAGE

Title (de)

SPENDERPACKUNG FÜR EINZELDOSIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

CONDITIONNEMENT DE DISTRIBUTION DE DOSE UNITAIRE

Publication

EP 1037823 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952318 A

Priority

  • US 9821795 W
  • US 6156497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919236A1] A unit dose storage and dispenser cartridge (10) for a unit dose of an ingredient (12) includes a storage and dispense container dispensably containing a unit dose of the ingredient (12). The container (10) includes a cylindrical interior wall (18) defining a cartridge passageway (30) having an ingredient-containing ingredient storage cavity portion (36). The container (10) further defines a dispense opening (24) communicating with the ingredient storage cavity portion (36) and includes a first sealing member (70) removably sealing the dispense opening (24). A dispense piston (34) is movable by a dasher rod (15) through the ingredient storage cavity portion (36) so as to dispense the unit dose of the ingredient (12) through the dispense opening (24). An openable vent (86) is positioned in registry with the cartridge passageway.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/54; G01F 11/06; G01F 11/30; G01F 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 11/06 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B65D 51/16 (2006.01); B65D 77/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B65D 88/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00576 (2013.01); B65D 51/1644 (2013.01); B65D 83/0005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919236 A1 19990422; AU 758658 B2 20030327; AU 9804698 A 19990503; BR 9814081 A 20000926; CA 2309698 A1 19990422; CN 1130300 C 20031210; CN 1279643 A 20010110; EP 1037823 A1 20000927; EP 1037823 A4 20021127; JP 2001519537 A 20011023; RU 2211792 C2 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-25 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032031

2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050915

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040927

2002-11-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE