Global Patent Index - EP 1037842 A1

EP 1037842 A1 2000-09-27 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR PREDICTING AND REGULATING A PAPER WINDING PARAMETER IN A PAPER WINDING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR PREDICTING AND REGULATING A PAPER WINDING PARAMETER IN A PAPER WINDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE UND REGELUNG EINER PAPIERWICKELKENNGRÖSSE BEI EINER PAPIERWICKELVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PREDIRE ET REGULER UNE CARACTERISTIQUE D'ENROULAGE DE PAPIER DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ENROULAGE DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1037842 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965599 A

Priority

  • DE 9803531 W
  • DE 19754878 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754878A1] In order to achieve a constant thickness when winding a paper strip, which represents an essential qualitative parameter in the production process of paper, the linear force (L) or the tensile force of the paper strip are corrected as an influencing force. The relationship between force and the thickness of the ply is determined by conducting measurements and feeding said measurements to a regulator. Winding is generally carried out from the drum to the winding station in winding devices. The invention is based on the relationship between winding and unwinding with the purpose of measuring the difference in thickness of the ply and training a predictor (Pi) with said measured values. During operation, a detectable parameter is measured to regulate a paper winding device. Said measured values are used to determine changes in the thickness of the ply or any other correlated qualitative parameter. In order to compensate for the idle time arising as a result of measurements, the predictor is supplied with specific qualitative parameters and exactly predicts the parameters achieved after the idle time has expired so that measurement of the predicted values corresponds with the actual measured value. Said parameters serve to establish the difference in regulation and are fed to the regulator which then calculates the corrective force used to correct the actual set influencing force of the paper winding device. This makes it possible to achieve constant or desired preset winding processes in paper winding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01); B65H 77/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 23/04 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/142 (2013.01); B65H 2515/31 (2013.01); B65H 2515/34 (2013.01); B65H 2557/2644 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2511/142 + B65H 2220/03
  3. B65H 2515/31 + B65H 2220/02
  4. B65H 2515/34 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929604A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754878 A1 19990624; AT 218493 T 20020615; BR 9813509 A 20001003; CA 2313461 A1 19990617; DK 1037842 T3 20020930; EP 1037842 A1 20000927; EP 1037842 B1 20020605; ES 2178304 T3 20021216; NO 20002995 A 20000609; NO 20002995 D0 20000609; NO 317470 B1 20041101; PT 1037842 E 20021129; US 6363297 B1 20020326; WO 9929604 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2013-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 218493 T

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20111231

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101203

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20101207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-03-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178304 T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804370 20020711

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218493 T 20020615

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011108

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE