Global Patent Index - EP 1037851 A1

EP 1037851 A1 2000-09-27 - TAP FOR REMOVING FLUID FROM A CONTAINER

Title (en)

TAP FOR REMOVING FLUID FROM A CONTAINER

Title (de)

ZAPFHAHN ZUR ENTNAHME VON FLUID AUS EINEM BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

ROBINET DE PRISE POUR LE PRELEVEMENT DE FLUIDE A PARTIR D'UN CONTENANT

Publication

EP 1037851 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965778 A

Priority

  • DE 29722034 U
  • DE 29722035 U
  • DE 19825929 A
  • EP 9807939 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931010A1] Disclosed is a tap for removing fluid from a container (10). Said tap comprises an outer tube which can be sealingly inserted in an opening (12) of the container (10). An inner tube (16) is sealingly and moveably accommodated in the outer tube (14). Said outer tube is also provided with an inlet (18). The inner tube (16) is also provided with an inlet (20) which communicates with an outlet (22) of the inner tube and which can move from a closed position (in which the inner tube (16) is fully inserted into the outer tube and the inlets (18,20) of the outer and inner tubes do not overlap) by moving the inner tube (16) into an open position (in which the inlets (18,20) of the outer and inner tubes overlap at least partially). A guide with an axial section (26) is provided in between the outer and inner tubes. Said guide enables the inner tube to be extracted from the outer tube (14) and placed in a stand-by position in which the inlets (18,20) do not yet overlap, whereby a peripheral section (28) connects with the axial section to enable the inner tube (16) to be rotated out of the stand-by position into an open position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931010A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931010 A1 19990624; AU 2158899 A 19990705; AU 746145 B2 20020418; EP 1037851 A1 20000927; EP 1037851 B1 20030319

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160203

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HUBER VERPACKUNGEN G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HUBER PACKAGING GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59807586

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110322

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807586

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010903

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL