Global Patent Index - EP 1037894 A1

EP 1037894 A1 2000-09-27 - PHARMACEUTICALS

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICALS

Title (de)

ARZNEIMITTEL

Title (fr)

PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1037894 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98965209 A

Priority

  • EP 9807764 W
  • GB 9725933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929697A1] Novel oxazino[3,2-a]indole-10-carboxamide derivatives having 5-HT4 receptor antagonist activity and useful in the treatment of gastrointestinal disorders, cardiovascular disorders and CNS disorders, including irritable bowel syndrome.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 498/04; A61K 31/535

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/5365 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/08 (2006.01); A61P 1/14 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 498/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929697A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929697 A1 19990617; CA 2312844 A1 19990617; EP 1037894 A1 20000927; GB 9725933 D0 19980204; JP 2001525415 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOSSNER, FRANKGLAXOSMITHKLINEMEDICINES RESEARCH

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FEDOULOFF, MICHAELGLAXOSMITHKLINEMEDICINES RESEA

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BUSH, BRIAN, DAVID

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL