Global Patent Index - EP 1037963 A1

EP 1037963 A1 2000-09-27 - X-RAY CRYSTAL COMPRISING HIV-1 GP120

Title (en)

X-RAY CRYSTAL COMPRISING HIV-1 GP120

Title (de)

RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN-KRISTALL, ENTHALTEND HIV-1 GP120

Title (fr)

RAYONS X CRISTAL COMPRENANT VIH-1 GP120

Publication

EP 1037963 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959406 A

Priority

  • US 9823905 W
  • US 96698797 A
  • US 96740397 A
  • US 96693297 A
  • US 96714897 A
  • US 97674197 A
  • US 10076398 A
  • US 10063198 A
  • US 10052998 A
  • US 10076298 A
  • US 10052198 A
  • US 8958098 P
  • US 8958198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924553A2] The subject invention provides a crystal suitable for X-ray diffraction comprising a polypeptide having an amino acid sequence of a portion of a Human Immunodeficiency Virus envelope glycoprotein gp120. The subject invention also provides the above-described crystals, wherein the crystal is arranged in a space group P2221, so as to form a unit cell of dimensions a=71.6 ANGSTROM , b=88.1 ANGSTROM , c=196.7 ANGSTROM , and which effectively diffracts X-rays for determination of the atomic coordinates of the gp120 to a resolution of 2.5 ANGSTROM or better. The subject invention additionally provides compounds inhibiting the CD4-gp 120 interaction, compounds inhibiting chemokine receptor-gp120 interaction, mimics of CD4, gp120 variants and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/16; A61K 38/00; C07K 14/73; C07K 16/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/16 (2006.01); C07K 14/73 (2006.01); C07K 16/08 (2006.01); G01N 23/20 (2006.01); G01N 23/201 (2006.01); G01N 23/207 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C12N (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 5/00 (2013.01); C07K 14/005 (2013.01); C07K 16/08 (2013.01); C12N 1/00 (2013.01); G01N 23/20 (2013.01); G01N 23/201 (2013.01); G01N 23/207 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924553 A2 19990520; WO 9924553 A3 20031211; WO 9924553 A8 19990722; WO 9924553 A9 20010531; EP 1037963 A1 20000927; EP 1037963 A4 20040922

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070512

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-09-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/16 A

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/73 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/08 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 5/00 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 23/20 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 23/201 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 23/207 B

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: X-RAY CRYSTAL COMPRISING HIV-1 GP120

2004-01-28 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-03-07 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE