Global Patent Index - EP 1037988 A1

EP 1037988 A1 2000-09-27 - HUMAN PROTEINS RESPONSIBLE FOR NEDD8 ACTIVATION AND CONJUGATION

Title (en)

HUMAN PROTEINS RESPONSIBLE FOR NEDD8 ACTIVATION AND CONJUGATION

Title (de)

HUMANE PROTEINE VERANTWORTLICH FÜR DIE NEDD8 AKTIVIERUNG UND KONJUGATION

Title (fr)

PROTEINES HUMAINES RESPONSABLES DE L'ACTIVATION ET DE LA CONJUGAISON DE NEDD8

Publication

EP 1037988 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964164 A

Priority

  • US 9827141 W
  • US 6820997 P
  • US 9652598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932624A1] The invention relates to covalent modification of proteins through their conjugation with other proteins. More particularly, the invention relates to the modulation of such conjugation involving the protein NEDD8. The invention provides compositions and methods for detecting and/or modulating the activation and/or conjugation of NEDD8, as well as compositions and methods for discovering molecules which are useful in detecting and/or modulating the activation and/or conjugation of NEDD8. The present invention arises from the purification and characterization of novel NEDD8 activating and conjugating enzymes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/47; C12N 9/00; C12N 15/11; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/00 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932624A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932624 A1 19990701; AU 1935099 A 19990712; AU 758077 B2 20030313; CA 2315240 A1 19990701; EP 1037988 A1 20000927; IL 136873 D0 20010614; JP 2001526890 A 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032422

2006-09-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060325

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE