Global Patent Index - EP 1038038 A1

EP 1038038 A1 2000-09-27 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIRECTLY REDUCED IRON IN A LAYERED FURNACE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIRECTLY REDUCED IRON IN A LAYERED FURNACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DIREKT REDUZIERTEM EISEN IN EINEM ETAGENOFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FER DIRECTEMENT REDUIT DANS UN FOUR A ETAGES

Publication

EP 1038038 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962432 A

Priority

  • EP 9808005 W
  • LU 90182 A
  • LU 90206 A
  • LU 90212 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929910A1] The invention relates to a method for producing reduced iron in a layered furnace comprising several superimposed layers, whereby ore is continually fed into the layered furnace, deposited on the uppermost layer, gradually transferred to the lower layers, and the reducing agent is deposited on the uppermost layer and/or layers thereunder and reacted with the ore in order to form directly reduced iron. The directly reduced iron and reducing agent residues are discharged in the vicinity of the lowest layer of the furnace.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 13/06; C21B 13/10; F27B 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/06 (2006.01); C21B 13/10 (2006.01); F27B 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/185 (2013.01); C21B 13/06 (2013.01); Y02P 10/122 (2015.11); Y02P 10/128 (2015.11); Y02P 10/136 (2015.11); Y02P 10/212 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929910A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929910 A1 19990617; AT 217350 T 20020515; AU 1760199 A 19990628; AU 756767 B2 20030123; BR 9815167 A 20001010; CA 2312465 A1 19990617; CN 1128231 C 20031119; CN 1285004 A 20010221; DE 59804094 D1 20020613; EP 1038038 A1 20000927; EP 1038038 B1 20020508; JP 2001526318 A 20011218; SK 8672000 A3 20001211; TR 200001639 T2 20001221; US 6395057 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-11-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PAUL *WURTH

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: UMICORE

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-03-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UMICORE

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-11-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804094 20020613

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000603

2002-05-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217350 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIRECTLY REDUCED IRON IN A MULTIPLE HEARTH FURNACE

2001-10-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIRECTLY REDUCED IRON IN A MULTIPLE HEARTH FURNACE

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRIEDEN, ROMAIN

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANSMANN, THOMAS

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOLVI, MARC

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000603