Global Patent Index - EP 1038059 A1

EP 1038059 A1 2000-09-27 - YARN WITH HEAT-ACTIVATED BINDER MATERIAL AND PROCESS OF MAKING

Title (en)

YARN WITH HEAT-ACTIVATED BINDER MATERIAL AND PROCESS OF MAKING

Title (de)

GARN MIT EINEM DURCH HITZE AKTIVIERTEN BINDEMATERIAL UND VERFAHRENSGANG

Title (fr)

FIL COMPRENANT UN MATERIAU DE LIAISON ACTIVE PAR LA CHALEUR ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE FIL

Publication

EP 1038059 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98948411 A

Priority

  • US 9819745 W
  • US 93382297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914408A1] Yarn suitable for tufting comprises a base fiber ring spun or wrap spun with a second fiber at least partially comprising a heat-activated adhesive material such that the yarn includes from 0.1 to 12, preferably 0.25 to 10, weight percent adhesive material having a melting point within the range of 105 DEG to 190 DEG C, more preferably 165 DEG to 190 DEG C. A preferred base fiber is a synthetic staple fiber bundle. A preferred wrapping or insert fiber is a copolyamide fiber, including ternary copolyamides of the 6/66/12 type. When the yarn is twist set by conventional processes and then tufted into carpet, the resulting carpet displays enhanced wear and appearance properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/40; D05C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/40 (2006.01); D05C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/402 (2013.01); D05C 17/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914408A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914408 A1 19990325; AU 741990 B2 20011213; AU 9498898 A 19990405; DE 69816860 D1 20030904; DE 69816860 T2 20040603; DE 69816860 T3 20080626; EP 1038059 A1 20000927; EP 1038059 B1 20030730; EP 1038059 B2 20080102; ZA 9808628 B 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110918

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110918

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-08 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-03-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-01-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHODIA PERFORMANCE FIBRES

2004-06-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RHODIA PERFORMANCE FIBRES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816860 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL