Global Patent Index - EP 1038061 A1

EP 1038061 A1 2000-09-27 - STORAGE DEVICE

Title (en)

STORAGE DEVICE

Title (de)

SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ACCUMULATEUR

Publication

EP 1038061 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966299 A

Priority

  • DE 19755160 A
  • EP 9808093 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755160A1] A storage device (E) for the weft yarn (W1,W2) of a power loom (L), wherein several yarn deflector elements (A-D, 61-65) are arranged along the path of the yarn leading from the yarn reserve to a feeder device (M) and at least one of said elements can move in relation to at least one other element in perpendicular manner with respect to the longitudinal direction of the yarn between a feed position (wherein the yarn runs in a substantially drawn position) and a storage position (1) in which the yarn runs in the form of a zigzag . One regulating device with at least one drive mechanism (71-7B) is provided and connected to each moveable yarn deflector element. A yarn tension damper is integrated into the storage device (E), having at least one first yarn deflector element (A) which can move in the direction in which the yarn is fed as an elastically readjusting damping element (N) moving towards the end of the feed when the yarn is tensioned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/36 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01); B65H 59/36 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929945A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755160 A1 19990617; EP 1038061 A1 20000927; EP 1038061 B1 20030319; WO 9929945 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Effective date: 20121231

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-12-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807587 P 20030424

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOSEFSSON, PAER

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL