Global Patent Index - EP 1038079 A2

EP 1038079 A2 2000-09-27 - CYLINDER LOCK WITH REPLACEABLE PLUG

Title (en)

CYLINDER LOCK WITH REPLACEABLE PLUG

Title (de)

ZYLINDERSCHLOSS MIT AUSWECHSELBAREM STOPFEN

Title (fr)

SERRURE DOTEE D'UN BARILLET REMPLA ABLE

Publication

EP 1038079 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98963688 A

Priority

  • SE 9802243 W
  • SE 9704610 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929985A1] In a cylinder lock-key combination an operator key with a back profile (34a-e, 35) is used, which profile interacts with concentric grooves (16a-e) in a cavity for the cylinder plug (20) to retain the plug against longitudinal movement in certain rotary positions. This feature is combined with protrusions (27) provided on the plug, which protrusions interact with the concentric grooves. Further, the cavity is provided with a longitudinal groove (17) that permits mutual longitudinal movement between the plug and the housing when said groove (17) is aligned with the protrusions on the plug. The plug is easy to replace when a service key lacking a back profile is used. This construction also gives a better mounting of the plug than with known locks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/08; E05B 15/06; E05B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05B 15/06 (2006.01); E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/086 (2013.01); E05B 19/0017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929985A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929985 A1 19990617; WO 9929985 A8 19991028; AU 1895999 A 19990628; AU 743807 B2 20020207; AU 7884698 A 19990701; CZ 20002153 A3 20010516; CZ 297960 B6 20070509; EE 04441 B1 20050215; EE 200000347 A 20011015; EP 1038079 A2 20000927; EP 1038079 B1 20031112; HU 0101123 A2 20010928; HU 0101123 A3 20020228; HU 224561 B1 20051028; IL 136649 A 20030917; IL 136649 D0 20010614; NZ 331247 A 20000128; PL 189468 B1 20050831; PL 341068 A1 20010326; SE 511113 C2 19990809; SE 9704610 D0 19971210; SE 9704610 L 19990611; TR 200001664 T2 20001023; YU 35700 A 20021018; YU 49284 B 20050315; ZA 9811281 B 19990609

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-04-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-02-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV RO

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000615;LV PAYMENT 20000615;RO PAYMENT 20000615