Global Patent Index - EP 1038096 A1

EP 1038096 A1 2000-09-27 - METAL FOIL WITH OPENINGS

Title (en)

METAL FOIL WITH OPENINGS

Title (de)

METALLFOLIE MIT DURCHBRECHUNGEN

Title (fr)

FEUILLE METALLIQUE COMPORTANT DES TROUS

Publication

EP 1038096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965782 A

Priority

  • DE 19755354 A
  • EP 9807954 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755354A1] The object of the invention is a flat entity inter alia, having at least two partially overlapping structures (10, 11, 14) which are located at a distance from a reference surface. An opening (16) is formed in an area (5) where the structures (10, 11, 14) overlap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; B01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2821 (2013.01); B01J 35/04 (2013.01); F01N 2330/321 (2013.01); F01N 2330/38 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1234 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12361 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1241 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931362A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755354 A1 19990617; AU 2159299 A 19990705; CN 1107789 C 20030507; CN 1281529 A 20010124; EP 1038096 A1 20000927; EP 1038096 B1 20040317; JP 2002508469 A 20020319; PL 193856 B1 20070330; PL 341477 A1 20010423; RU 2213231 C2 20030927; US 6316121 B1 20011113; WO 9931362 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101208

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811018 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT