Global Patent Index - EP 1038107 A1

EP 1038107 A1 2000-09-27 - REFRIGERATING AGENT COMPRESSOR WITH IMPROVED VALVE

Title (en)

REFRIGERATING AGENT COMPRESSOR WITH IMPROVED VALVE

Title (de)

KÄLTEMITTELVERDICHTER MIT VERBESSERTEM VENTIL

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR POUR APPAREILS FRIGORIFIQUES A SOUPAPE AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 1038107 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958725 A

Priority

  • AT 9800303 W
  • AT 77397 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930037A1] The invention relates to a refrigerating agent compressor for electrical refrigerating appliances, especially for household refrigerators and deep freezers. Said compressor comprises an inner body, a piston which can move in a cylinder, a first compressor seal, a valve spring, a valve plate provided with a refrigerating agent suction bore and a valve block, the valve plate having two recesses provided on its side oriented towards the valve spring. Said compressor is designed so that two externally projecting parts of the spring are inclined and able to enter said recesses and become blocked inside said recesses, and so that a part of the remaining surface of the valve spring is mounted in a way enabling it to move and in a position closely adjacent to the surface of the valve plate oriented towards the interior of the cylinder, for blocking the suction bore provided in the valve plate. The valve spring only comprises the surface with which it is possible to block the suction bore provided in the valve plate, the two side surfaces which can be blocked in said recesses, as well as a surface held by a compressor seal, in a way to be closely adjacent to the surface of the valve plate which faces the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/1073 (2013.01); F05B 2230/60 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7891 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930037A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930037 A1 19990617; BR 9813552 A 20001017; CN 1100946 C 20030205; CN 1281536 A 20010124; DE 59803788 D1 20020516; DK 1038107 T3 20020819; EP 1038107 A1 20000927; EP 1038107 B1 20020410; ES 2174515 T3 20021101; JP 2001526359 A 20011218; US 6293774 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SECOP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SECOP AUSTRIA GMBH, FUERSTENFELD, AT

- Document: DE 59803788

2016-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

2014-05-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SECOP AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VERDICHTER OE GES.M.B.H., FUERSTENFELD, AT

- Document: DE 59803788

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-05-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SECOP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VERDICHTER OE GES.M.B.H., FUERSTENFELD, AT

- Document: DE 59803788

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803788

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041211

2005-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051210

2005-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2003-12-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174515 T3

2002-08-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803788 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000613

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000613