Global Patent Index - EP 1038108 A1

EP 1038108 A1 2000-09-27 - REFRIGERATING AGENT COMPRESSOR WITH IMPROVED PRESSURE CHAMBER

Title (en)

REFRIGERATING AGENT COMPRESSOR WITH IMPROVED PRESSURE CHAMBER

Title (de)

KÄLTEMITTELVERDICHTER MIT VERBESSERTER DRUCKKAMMER

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR POUR MACHINES FRIGORIFIQUES A CHAMBRE DE COMPRESSION AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 1038108 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959667 A

Priority

  • AT 9800304 W
  • AT 77597 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930038A1] The invention relates to a refrigerating agent compressor for electrical refrigerating appliances, especially for household refrigerators and deep freezers. Said compressor comprises an outer housing, an inner body, a pressure chamber integrated into said inner body and a lid used for closing the opening of the pressure chamber. The lid and the pressure chamber are provided with an annular flat edge (5) arranged in the region of the opening of the pressure chamber, as well as with a corresponding annular flat edge (6) which extends along the closing circumference of the lid. The annular flat edges can be mutually coupled so as to be steadily and reliably assembled. One of these annular flat edges is provided with a rib protruding relatively to the other opposite annular edge, and has a radial vertical profile which is substantially triangular, with a corner oriented towards the exterior, the angle of such a corner being comprised between 70 and 90 DEG . The bottom (E) of said pressure chamber is flat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/12; F04B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 8/18 (2006.01); F04B 11/00 (2006.01); F04B 39/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/125 (2013.01); F04B 11/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930038A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930038 A1 19990617; BR 9814269 A 20001003; DE 59803789 D1 20020516; DK 1038108 T3 20020805; EP 1038108 A1 20000927; EP 1038108 B1 20020410; ES 2174518 T3 20021101; JP 2001526360 A 20011218; US 6401965 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2006-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041211

2005-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051210

2005-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2003-12-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174518 T3

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803789 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000613

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000613