Global Patent Index - EP 1038146 A1

EP 1038146 A1 2000-09-27 - LIQUEFACTION PROCESS AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

LIQUEFACTION PROCESS AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFLÜSSIGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE LIQUEFACTION

Publication

EP 1038146 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959046 A

Priority

  • GB 9803708 W
  • GB 9726297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930094A1] Apparatus for liquefying natural gas, comprising a series of heat exchangers for cooling the natural gas in countercurrent heat exchange relationship with a refrigerant, compression means for compressing the refrigerant, expansion means for isentropically expanding at least two separate streams of the compressed refrigerant, said expanded streams of refrigerant communicating with a cool end of a respective one of the heat exchangers, and a precooling refrigeration system for precooling the natural gas to a temperature below 0 DEG C before it is fed to the series of heat exchangers, and for precooling the compressed refrigerant discharged from a warm end of the series of heat exchangers to a temperature below 0 DEG C before it is fed back into the series of heat exchanges or to the expansion means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0257 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/005 (2013.01); F25J 1/0052 (2013.01); F25J 1/0072 (2013.01); F25J 1/0097 (2013.01); F25J 1/0205 (2013.01); F25J 1/0267 (2013.01); F25J 1/0278 (2013.01); F25J 1/0283 (2013.01); F25J 1/0288 (2013.01); F25J 1/0292 (2013.01); F25J 1/0294 (2013.01); F25J 1/0297 (2013.01); F25J 3/0209 (2013.01); F25J 3/0233 (2013.01); F25J 2200/02 (2013.01); F25J 2200/70 (2013.01); F25J 2215/04 (2013.01); F25J 2230/22 (2013.01); F25J 2230/60 (2013.01); F25J 2270/16 (2013.01); F25J 2290/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930094A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930094 A1 19990617; AU 1497799 A 19990628; AU 752201 B2 20020912; DE 69819366 D1 20031204; DE 69819366 T2 20040624; EP 1038146 A1 20000927; EP 1038146 B1 20031029; GB 9726297 D0 19980211; JP 2001526376 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69819366

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101211

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101211

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819366 P 20031204

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB