Global Patent Index - EP 1038245 A4

EP 1038245 A4 2002-11-13 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN EXPRESSION DATA MINING DATABASE AND LABORATORY INFORMATION MANAGEMENT

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN EXPRESSION DATA MINING DATABASE AND LABORATORY INFORMATION MANAGEMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR VERSORGUNG EINER EXPRESSIONSDATENMINEN-DATENBANK UND LABORINFORMATIONSMANAGEMENT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR L'ELABORATION D'UNE BASE DE DONNEES QUI PERMET D'EXTRAIRE DES DONNEES RELATIVES A L'EXPRESSION ET D'ASSURER LA GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE LABORATOIRE

Publication

EP 1038245 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99954613 A

Priority

  • US 9921305 W
  • US 10072498 P
  • US 10074098 P
  • US 35493599 A
  • US 39749499 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] ERMOLAEVA O ET AL: "DATA MANAGEMENT AND ANALYSIS FOR GENE EXPRESSION ARRAYS", NATURE GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, no. 20, September 1998 (1998-09-01), pages 19 - 23, XP002950500, ISSN: 1061-4036
  • [A] KERLAVAGE A R ET AL: "DATA MANAGEMENT AND ANALYSIS FOR HIGH-THROUGHPUT DNA SEQUENCING PROJECTS", IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY MAGAZINE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, vol. 14, no. 6, 1 November 1995 (1995-11-01), pages 710 - 717, XP000598295, ISSN: 0739-5175
  • [A] ALLEE C: "DATA MANAGEMENT FOR AUTOMATED DRUG DISCOVERY LABORATORIES", LABORATORY ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, VCH PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, US, vol. 8, no. 5, 1996, pages 307 - 310, XP000901022, ISSN: 0895-7533
  • See also references of WO 0016220A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038245 A1 20000927; EP 1038245 A4 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060331

2002-11-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE