Global Patent Index - EP 1038269 A1

EP 1038269 A1 2000-09-27 - A HISTOGRAM METHOD FOR CHARACTERIZING VIDEO CONTENT

Title (en)

A HISTOGRAM METHOD FOR CHARACTERIZING VIDEO CONTENT

Title (de)

HISTOGRAMMVERFAHREN ZUR VIDEOINHALTCHARAKTERISIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'HISTOGRAMME POUR CARACTERISER UN CONTENU VIDEO

Publication

EP 1038269 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936492 A

Priority

  • EP 9904767 W
  • US 11676998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004498A1] In order to characterize video content, key frames are identified in that content. The key frames are collapsed into histograms. The histograms are grouped into families. The families are each represented by a family histogram. The family histograms characterize the video content. The family histograms can be used to determine program boundaries or index the video content.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/76 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/20 (2006.01); G11B 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00711 (2013.01); G06T 7/00 (2013.01); G11B 27/28 (2013.01); H04N 21/44008 (2013.01); G11B 2220/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004498A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004498 A1 20000127; DE 69940541 D1 20090423; EP 1038269 A1 20000927; EP 1038269 B1 20090311; JP 2002520747 A 20020709; JP 4445131 B2 20100407; US 6473095 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110707

2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69940541

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091214

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940541 P 20090423

2009-03-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: IPG ELECTRONICS 503 LIMITED

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050128

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT