Global Patent Index - EP 1038287 A1

EP 1038287 A1 2000-09-27 - EQUIPMENT WITH MARKINGS PROVIDED FOR THEFT PROTECTION AND MARKED EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

EQUIPMENT WITH MARKINGS PROVIDED FOR THEFT PROTECTION AND MARKED EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

BETRIEBSMITTEL MIT KENNZEICHNUNG GEGEN DIEBSTAHLSCHUTZ UND GEKENNZEICHNETES BETRIEBSMITTEL

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT AVEC MARQUAGE ANTIVOL ET EQUIPEMENT AINSI MARQUE

Publication

EP 1038287 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959907 A

Priority

  • DE 19754404 A
  • EP 9807848 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754404A1] Visually observable and visually non-observable marking means are used for marking equipment, whereby the latter are, for example, UV paints which can only be observed under UV light. According to the invention, a label (6) portraying the company logo (3) is glued on an article (2) which is to be marked. The label (6) has punches such that the marking means (4) reproduce the logo on the surface (7) of the article (2) in an unobservable manner when the outer (8) and inner (9) edges of the label (6) are painted over. In addition, the logo remains (at 1) as a non-marked surface (5) in the unobservable UV film (4) after the label is removed (6). The invention is suited for protectively marking equipment against theft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44F 1/12 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0294 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930305A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754404 A1 19990610; AT 223099 T 20020915; EP 1038287 A1 20000927; EP 1038287 B1 20020828; JP 2001526410 A 20011218; US 6409218 B1 20020625; WO 9930305 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805353

2016-01-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805353

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223099 T

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #38436 WOLFSBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #38436 WOLFSBURG (DE)

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-11-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805353 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223099 T 20020915

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL