Global Patent Index - EP 1038290 A1

EP 1038290 A1 2000-09-27 - ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER WITH A CUP-SHAPED SUPPORT

Title (en)

ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER WITH A CUP-SHAPED SUPPORT

Title (de)

ULTRASCHALLWANDLER MIT TOPFÖRMIGER HALTERUNG

Title (fr)

TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONORE A SUPPORT CUPULIFORME

Publication

EP 1038290 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962245 A

Priority

  • DE 9803297 W
  • DE 19754891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930313A1] Disclosed is an ultrasonic transducer that can be used as a transmitter and a receiver in pulse echo applications, especially in automobiles, to detect objects inside the automobile, i.e. for controlling air bag ignition during an accident. The inventive ultrasonic transducer comprises a membrane (2) with a piezoelectric plate (3) on the back thereof. The diameter of the piezoelectric plate (3) is 60 % -85 % the diameter of the membrane (2). A material (4) made of a soft open cell material is foamed on the back of the main surface of the membrane (2). Advantageous features with respect to the sensitivity and the mechanical quality of the transducer are obtained by foaming said material. The cited ratio between the diameter of the piezo ceramic element (3) and the membrane (2) provides a large aperture angle of the sound radiation when said foamed material is used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 9/122

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 17/00 (2006.01); G10K 9/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930313A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930313 A1 19990617; DE 19754891 C1 19990715; EP 1038290 A1 20000927; EP 1038290 B1 20040128; JP 2001526479 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-07-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810685 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POTAPOV, VLADIMIR

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOEN, UWE

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAHN, THOMAS

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL