Global Patent Index - EP 1038300 B1

EP 1038300 B1 2001-12-05 - HIGHLY RADIOACTIVE MINIATURIZED CERAMIC STRONTIUM 90 RADIATION SOURCE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

HIGHLY RADIOACTIVE MINIATURIZED CERAMIC STRONTIUM 90 RADIATION SOURCE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

HOCHRADIOAKTIVE MINIATURISIERTE KERAMISCHE STRONTIUM-90-STRAHLENQUELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SOURCES DE RAYONNEMENT EN CERAMIQUE A BASE DE STRONTIUM 90 MINIATURISEES HAUTEMENT RADIOACTIVES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DESDITES SOURCES

Publication

EP 1038300 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947320 A

Priority

  • DE 19848312 A
  • EP 9906732 W
  • US 10670098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0022628A1] The invention relates to highly radioactive miniaturized cylindrical radiation sources made of strontium 90/titanate, strontium 90/ zirconate and strontium 90/silicate. Said radiation sources have an activity that is greater than 25 mCi/mm<3>, preferably >/= 30 mCi/mm<3>, and a diameter of less than 0.7 mm, preferably less than 0.4 mm. The invention also relates to a method for producing these extremely small but highly radioactive radiation sources.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21G 4/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61M 36/14 (2006.01); C01F 13/00 (2006.01); C01F 15/00 (2006.01); C01G 43/00 (2006.01); C01G 56/00 (2006.01); C01G 99/00 (2010.01); G21C 21/00 (2006.01); G21G 4/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21G 4/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0022628 A1 20000420; EP 1038300 A1 20000927; EP 1038300 B1 20011205; US 6613303 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-07-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900492 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI