Global Patent Index - EP 1038332 A1

EP 1038332 A1 2000-09-27 - DUAL BAND ANTENNA

Title (en)

DUAL BAND ANTENNA

Title (de)

ZWEIBANDANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A DOUBLE BANDE

Publication

EP 1038332 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962782 A

Priority

  • SE 9802235 W
  • SE 9704642 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931757A1] An aperture-coupled antenna, comprising at least one antenna element including a number of substantially planar, mutually parallel radiating patches (1-3) being fed with microwave power from a feed network (6) via an aperture (5a, 5b) in a ground plane layer (4). The feed network (6) feeds microwave power in at least two separate frequency bands, including a first, relatively low frequency band and a second, relatively high frequency band. A first patch (2) radiates microwave power in said first frequency band and is provided with an aperture (9a, 9b) so as to couple microwave power in said second frequency band to a second patch (1), the microwave power in said second frequency band being fed from the feed network (6) via the apertures (5a, 5b; 9a, 9b) in said ground plane layer (4) and said first patch (2) to said second patch (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/10 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 5/378 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0414 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0428 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931757A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931757 A1 19990624; AU 1794099 A 19990705; BR 9813505 A 20001010; BR 9813505 B1 20120502; CN 1147966 C 20040428; CN 1281590 A 20010124; DE 69839348 D1 20080521; DE 69839348 T2 20080717; EP 1038332 A1 20000927; EP 1038332 B1 20080409; ES 2301218 T3 20080616; HK 1033210 A1 20050218; SE 511064 C2 19990726; SE 9704642 D0 19971212; SE 9704642 L 19990613; TW 413967 B 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161207

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: INTEL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20161202

2016-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161013 AND 20161019

2016-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161006 AND 20161012

2016-09-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160811 AND 20160817

2016-07-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: INTEL CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-07-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INTEL CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20160603

2016-07-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INTEL CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-07-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INTEL CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-06-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL CORP., SANTA CLARA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALLGON AB, TAEBY, SE

- Document: DE 69839348

2016-06-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839348

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

2016-05-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160421 AND 20160428

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-03-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2301218 T3

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69839348 P 20080521

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041102

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT