Global Patent Index - EP 1038336 A1

EP 1038336 A1 2000-09-27 - REEL-SHAPED SHELL FOR DC POWER SUPPLY ADAPTOR

Title (en)

REEL-SHAPED SHELL FOR DC POWER SUPPLY ADAPTOR

Title (de)

HASPELFORMIGES GEHÄUSE FÜR GLEICHSTROMVERSORGUNGS-ADAPTER

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE BOBINE POUR ADAPTATEUR D'ALIMENTATION CC

Publication

EP 1038336 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97949103 A

Priority

IT 9700310 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931768A1] An outstandingly effective shell (1) for a DC power supply adaptor (5) of portable apparatuses provides for an easy retrieval and orderly disposition of the DC output cable (7) and of its termination without requiring the use of separate elastic straps or similar holding means, providing for a compact assembly without any dangling part that is far more easy to pack and to handle for transportation and use than the nude adaptor (5). In addition, the shell (1) of the invention provides for a permanent resilient impact absorbing outer protection of the box-like plastic container (5) of the power supply circuitry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/72; H01R 13/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6675 (2013.01); H01R 13/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931768A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931768 A1 19990624; DE 69715475 D1 20021017; DE 69715475 T2 20030109; EP 1038336 A1 20000927; EP 1038336 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071212

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715475 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011116

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT