Global Patent Index - EP 1038338 A1

EP 1038338 A1 2000-09-27 - DOUBLE-CLAD RARE EARTH DOPED OPTICAL FIBERS

Title (en)

DOUBLE-CLAD RARE EARTH DOPED OPTICAL FIBERS

Title (de)

DOPPELT UMMANTELTE, MIT SELTENEN ERDEN DOTIERTE OPTISCHE FASER

Title (fr)

FIBRES OPTIQUES DOPEES AUX TERRES RARES A DOUBLE GAINAGE

Publication

EP 1038338 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98960794 A

Priority

  • US 9825943 W
  • US 98786297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930391A1] An optical fiber (10) made with a central core (12), a first cladding layer (16), and a second cladding layer (18) having a series of perturbations or irregularities formed into the otherwise generally circular outer boundary of the first cladding layer. The irregularities in the first cladding layer interrupt the propagation of skew rays and encourage coupling into the core. The irregularities are formed by drilling holes (44-58) in the fiber preform, which are parallel with its longitudinal axis, and inserting rods therein. An intermediate cladding layer (14) is provided for suppressing higher order core modes. The optical fibers are used in cladding pumped fiber lasers and amplifiers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/06; G02B 6/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/036 (2006.01); G02B 6/10 (2006.01); H01S 3/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/03694 (2013.01); G02B 6/03622 (2013.01); G02B 6/03638 (2013.01); G02B 6/105 (2013.01); H01S 3/06708 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930391A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930391 A1 19990617; BR 9813450 A 20010828; DE 1038338 T1 20010208; EP 1038338 A1 20000927; ES 2154251 T1 20010401

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-04-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154251

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2001-02-08 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB